+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 626
- Senate Calendar Number 387
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2018: FIN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
March 15, 2018: HED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2018: HED Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor