+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rejected
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 830
- Senate Calendar Number 431
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/15
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor