+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 595
- Senate Calendar Number 434
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
- Vote to Reconsider
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor