+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 406
- Senate Calendar Number 237
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Vote
March 23, 2018: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor