+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 477
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4096
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 224
- File Number 331
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 24, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 180 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor