+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 276
- File Number 434
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor