+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 52
- File Number 26
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsors (5)
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor