+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- File Number 455
- Senate Calendar Number 319
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor