+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-90
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 507
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4907
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 341
- Senate Calendar Number 214
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Amendments (13)
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: BA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Banking Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor