+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 448
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 46
- File Number 10
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/14 5:00 PM
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Vote
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 152 PASS
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor