+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 307
- File Number 489
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (4)
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor