+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 407
- File Number 615
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (5)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor