+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Public Act 13-222
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 597
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7005
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 558
- Senate Calendar Number 408
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 336 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 287 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (12)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor