+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 542
- Senate Calendar Number 371
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/24
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor