+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-78
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On May 4, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 521
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5060
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3961
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 351
- File Number 523
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 275 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 9
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 281 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3961
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 282 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (5)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor