+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-99
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On May 4, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 505
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4165
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
- Senate Reconsidered
- Matter Pass Retained
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Education
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 130
- File Number 166
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 276 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (4)
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor