+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-174
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 540
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5439
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 281
- File Number 432
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 363 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor