+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-77
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 490
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4552
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 295
- File Number 461
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 274 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
April 30, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 233 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (27)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor