+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 96
- File Number 103
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor