+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-214
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 520
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4998
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5013
- On Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 431
- Senate Calendar Number 292
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 269 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor