+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 712
- New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/14 5:00 PM
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 520
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 354
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor