+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 297
- File Number 460
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor