+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 552
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6403
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 276
- Senate Calendar Number 199
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/17
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
May 14, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 164 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor