+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 494
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4946
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 4946
- On Consent Calendar
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
- Matter Pass Retained
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Human Services
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 420
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 51
- File Number 25
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor