+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-7
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 465
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3695
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 298
- Senate Calendar Number 170
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/16
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 22, 2018: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor