+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-212
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 541
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5110
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5583
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 293
- File Number 459
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 369 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor