+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 724
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 226
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 442
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor