+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Sponsors (43)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor