+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-139
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 550
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7225
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 247
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 190
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 298 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
May 14, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 171
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor