+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 427
- Senate Calendar Number 289
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor