+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Passed Temporary
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 503
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 548
- Senate Calendar Number 333
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/16
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 5, 2018: FIN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor