+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 5
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 60
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/16 5:00 PM
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/16
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees