+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 218
- File Number 289
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor