+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-208
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 476
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3358
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 230
- File Number 328
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
April 24, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 181 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (3)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor