+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 479
- Senate Calendar Number 310
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/24
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor