+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor