+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor