+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 546
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 295
- Senate Calendar Number 167
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: BA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Banking Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor