+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsors (2)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor