+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 759
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/14 5:00 PM
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 402
- File Number 610
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor