+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-117
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8195
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8187
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8131
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 645
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7794
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7780
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 49
- Senate Calendar Number 108
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 01/31
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (16)
+ − Votes (7)
May 29, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 296 SENATE AMD A
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 4
May 29, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 297 HOUSE AMD A
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 85
- Absent: 12
May 29, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 298 HOUSE AMD B
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 86
- Absent: 12
May 29, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 299 HOUSE AMD C
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 90
- Absent: 10
May 29, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 300 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 53
- Absent: 8
May 23, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 376 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 7794
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 377 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 15
+ − Sponsors (39)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor