+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 282
- File Number 425
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor