+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-41
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 551
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5510
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 445
- Senate Calendar Number 287
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 227 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 5
April 29, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 256
- Yeas: 36