+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 235
- Senate Calendar Number 180
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor