+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-32
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 329
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 234
- Senate Calendar Number 179
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 186
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 16
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 87 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (12)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor