+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 501
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,E
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule E 4735
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 4721
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 4739
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4740
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4447
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 327
- Senate Calendar Number 237
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (4)
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 247 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4740
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 2
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 248 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4739
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 2
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 249 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 4721
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 250 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,E
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (6)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor