+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 601
- Senate Calendar Number 322
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/10
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
January 25, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor