+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Special Act 14-10
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- In Concurrence
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 311
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 106
- File Number 102
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 267
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 83 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor