+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 519
- Senate Calendar Number 323
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/28
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Vote
April 5, 2018: APP Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 51
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor