+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-76
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 544
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6281
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 533
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 392
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 266 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 35
- Absent: 10
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 219 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (14)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor